Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/09/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/06/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/06/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 04/06/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/06/2005
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/14/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/14/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/14/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/26/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/27/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/21/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/21/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/21/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/06/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/06/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 12/12/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/15/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/07/2006
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/17/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/05/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/05/2006