Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/12/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 04/14/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/24/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/26/2005