Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/08/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/16/2005
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 04/11/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/15/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/09/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/10/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 05/10/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/12/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/13/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/20/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 06/20/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/01/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/01/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 07/25/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/29/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 10/18/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 11/09/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/01/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/07/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/03/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/22/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/05/2006