There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Rio Grande Natural Area Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Rio Grande Natural Area Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Rio Grande Natural Area Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Rio Grande Natural Area Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish the Rio Grande Natural Area in the State of Colorado, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
10/12/2006Became Public Law No: 109-337. (TXT | PDF)
10/12/2006Signed by President.
10/02/2006Presented to President.
09/27/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7657-7658)
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9045-9046)
03/30/2005Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici under authority of the order of the Senate of 3-17-2005 without amendment. With written report No. 109-45.
01/24/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/12/2006Became Public Law No: 109-337. (TXT | PDF)
10/12/2006Signed by President.
10/02/2006SenatePresented to President.
09/27/2006-11:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/27/2006-11:22pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7657-7658)
09/27/2006-11:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 56.
09/27/2006-11:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7657-7659)
09/27/2006-11:20pmHouseMr. Gohmert moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/09/2006HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health
08/01/2005HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
08/01/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2005-10:35amHouseReceived in the House.
07/26/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9045-9046)
03/30/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 64.
03/30/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici under authority of the order of the Senate of 3-17-2005 without amendment. With written report No. 109-45.
02/16/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/24/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 01/24/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/24/2005 Referred to
02/16/2005 Markup by
03/30/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-45
House Resources07/27/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health08/01/2005 Referred to
03/09/2006 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for S.56.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.56. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-337 (10/12/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

Rio Grande Natural Area Act - (Sec. 3) Establishes the Rio Grande Natural Area in Colorado (which shall include the Rio Grande River from the southern boundary of the Alamosa National Wildlife Refuge to the New Mexico State border, extending 1/4 mile on either side of the bank of the River) to conserve, restore, and protect the natural, historic, cultural, scientific, scenic, wildlife, and recreational resources of the Area.

(Sec. 4) Establishes the Rio Grande Natural Area Commission to: (1) advise the Secretary of the Interior with respect to the Area; and (2) prepare a management plan relating to nonfederal land in the Area.

(Sec. 5) Sets forth provisions governing the powers of the Commission, including authorizing the Commission to enter into cooperative agreements for purposes of carrying out such management plan on nonfederal land in the Area. Prohibits the Commission from acquiring any real property or interest in real property.

Directs the Commission to assist the Secretary in implementing such management plan by carrying out authorized activities to preserve and interpret the Area's natural, historic, cultural, scientific, scenic, wildlife, and recreational resources.

(Sec. 6) Directs the Secretary to prepare a management plan for Federal land in the Area. Requires the Commission to submit its management plan for the management of the nonfederal land in the Area to the Secretary for approval or disapproval.

(Sec. 7) Requires the Secretary to administer the Federal land in the Area in accordance with the laws applicable to public land and the management plan in a manner that provides for: (1) education, scientific study, and limited public recreation; (2) the protection of the wildlife habitat; (3) a prohibition on the construction of water storage facilities; and (4) the reduction in the use or removal of roads in the Area.

Encourages the Secretary to negotiate with the State, the Rio Grande Water Conservation District, and affected water users concerning changes in the streamflow.

Applies the management plan for the nonfederal land to private land in the Area only if the private landowner agrees to be bound by such plan.

Permits the Secretary to acquire land or an interest in land within the Area from willing sellers.

Makes inapplicable Wild and Scenic Rivers Act requirements that Federal agencies consider potential national wild, scenic, and recreational river areas in water and land use planning.

(Sec. 8) Prohibits anything in this Act from: (1) modifying the Rio Grande Compact; (2) regulating private land; (3) imposing any mandatory streamflow requirements; (4) creating an express or implied Federal reserved water right; (5) imposing more restrictive Federal water quality standards; or (6) preventing State acquisition of an instream flow to assist in protecting the natural environment.

(Sec. 9) Authorizes appropriations.

(Sec. 10) Terminates the Commission ten years after the enactment of this Act.