Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/04/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/04/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/21/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/26/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/10/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/10/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/14/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/22/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/29/2005
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/24/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/29/2006