Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 03/09/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/05/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/05/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/05/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 04/05/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/05/2005
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/05/2005
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/05/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 04/05/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 04/05/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 04/05/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/05/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 04/05/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/05/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/05/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/05/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/05/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/05/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 04/05/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 04/05/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/05/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/05/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/05/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/05/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/05/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/05/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/05/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/05/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/05/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/05/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/05/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 04/05/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/05/2005
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 04/05/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/05/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/05/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/05/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/05/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 04/05/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/05/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/05/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/05/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/05/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/05/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/12/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/12/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 04/12/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/12/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/12/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/12/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/12/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/12/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/12/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/12/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/12/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/12/2005
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/12/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/12/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/12/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/13/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 04/26/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 04/26/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/26/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 04/26/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/26/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/26/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/28/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/12/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 05/23/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/08/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 06/08/2005