Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/10/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/14/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/14/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 03/14/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/17/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 03/19/2005
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/06/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/14/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/18/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 04/25/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/25/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/09/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/11/2005
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/26/2005
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/30/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/08/2006