Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 03/11/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/11/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 03/11/2005
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 03/11/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 04/19/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 04/19/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/10/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 05/17/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/17/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/18/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 05/24/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/26/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/06/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/07/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/20/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/20/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/29/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/12/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/13/2005