Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/04/2005
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 04/04/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 04/04/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/05/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/05/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/05/2005
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/07/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/11/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/11/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 04/11/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/11/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/11/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/11/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 04/11/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/12/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 04/12/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/13/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/18/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 04/18/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/18/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/19/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/21/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/26/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 04/26/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/27/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/28/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/09/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/09/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/09/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/09/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/10/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/11/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/16/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/23/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 05/24/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/25/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/06/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/09/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/20/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/20/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/20/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/20/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 06/22/2005
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/27/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/18/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/18/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/06/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/09/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/14/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/20/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/07/2005
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 10/27/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/27/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 11/01/2005
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 11/01/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 11/02/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 11/08/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/09/2005
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 11/10/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 11/18/2005
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 12/12/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/27/2006
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/03/2006
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 04/04/2006
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/05/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/05/2006
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/07/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/25/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/18/2006