Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/16/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 04/04/2005
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 04/04/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/04/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/04/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/04/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/05/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/11/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/12/2005
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/14/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 04/21/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/27/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/09/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/16/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/23/2005
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/23/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/23/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 05/23/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 05/25/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/25/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/26/2005
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 05/26/2005
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/06/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/09/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/16/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/20/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 06/21/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 06/22/2005
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/22/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/01/2005
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/13/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/14/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/18/2005