Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 01/25/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/31/2005
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 02/14/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 02/28/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/02/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/07/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/15/2005
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 04/05/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/13/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/13/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/18/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/20/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/07/2005
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/07/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/07/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/13/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 07/27/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/09/2005
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/07/2006
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/03/2006
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/06/2006
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/14/2006
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 09/21/2006