There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Benjamin Franklin National Memorial Commemoration Act of 2005

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Benjamin Franklin National Memorial Commemoration Act of 2005

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Benjamin Franklin National Memorial Commemoration Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

Benjamin Franklin National Memorial Commemoration Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide financial assistance for the rehabilitation of the Benjamin Franklin National Memorial in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, and the development of an exhibit to commemorate the 300th anniversary of the birth of Benjamin Franklin.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/30/2005Became Public Law No: 109-153. (TXT | PDF)
12/30/2005Signed by President.
12/22/2005Presented to President.
12/19/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H12215)
12/19/2005Committee on Resources discharged.
11/16/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S13045; text as passed Senate: CR S14045)
10/19/2005Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 109-147.
03/17/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/30/2005Became Public Law No: 109-153. (TXT | PDF)
12/30/2005Signed by President.
12/22/2005SenatePresented to President.
12/19/2005-12:59amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/19/2005-12:59amHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H12215)
12/19/2005-12:58amHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H12215)
12/19/2005-12:58amHouseMr. Pombo asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
12/19/2005HouseCommittee on Resources discharged.
12/02/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Resources
11/17/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
11/17/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/17/2005-10:02amHouseReceived in the House.
11/16/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S13045; text as passed Senate: CR S14045)
10/19/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 239.
10/19/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 109-147.
07/28/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 109-201.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
03/17/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
03/17/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3006-3007)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 03/17/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/17/2005 Referred to
10/19/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-147
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks07/28/2005 Hearings by
House Resources11/17/2005 Referred to
12/19/2005 Discharged from
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands12/02/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.652. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-153 (12/30/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Benjamin Franklin National Memorial Commemoration Act of 2005 - Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to provide a grant to the Franklin Institute to: (1) rehabilitate the Benjamin Franklin National Memorial (including the Franklin statue) in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania; and (2) develop an interpretive exhibit relating to Benjamin Franklin, to be displayed at a museum adjacent to the Benjamin Franklin National Memorial.

Authorizes appropriations. Directs the Secretary to require the Franklin Institute to match any amounts provided under this Act.