Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/06/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 06/30/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/02/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/08/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/06/2006