Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/17/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 03/17/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/12/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/26/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/25/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 07/12/2005

Show cosponsors who withdrew