Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 04/12/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/18/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/21/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 05/10/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/27/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/22/2006