Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 03/17/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 03/17/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/17/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/13/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 12/07/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/08/2006