Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 04/04/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 04/04/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 04/04/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 04/04/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 04/04/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 04/04/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/04/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 04/04/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/25/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/28/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/30/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/14/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 12/14/2005