Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 01/24/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 01/24/2005
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/14/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/07/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/14/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 04/27/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/17/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/14/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/25/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/29/2005