Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 04/05/2005
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 11/15/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/15/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 11/15/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 11/15/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/15/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 11/15/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 11/15/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/15/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 11/15/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/15/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/15/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/15/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/15/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/15/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 11/15/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 11/15/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 12/13/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 12/13/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 12/13/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 12/13/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 12/21/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/30/2006
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/30/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 01/30/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/16/2006
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/13/2006
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/13/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/13/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/13/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/13/2006
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/29/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/29/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/26/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/26/2006
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/27/2006
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/26/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/08/2006
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/23/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/25/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/31/2006
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 08/01/2006