There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Vet Center Enhancement Act of 2005

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Vet Center Enhancement Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

Vet Center Enhancement Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to enhance services provided by vet centers, to clarify and improve the provision of bereavement counseling by the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/22/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S14410-14411; text as passed Senate: CR S14410-14411)
11/16/2005Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Craig without amendment. With written report No. 109-180.
04/06/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
01/19/2006HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
12/22/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
12/22/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/22/2005-4:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/22/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S14410-14411; text as passed Senate: CR S14410-14411)
11/16/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 290.
11/16/2005SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Craig without amendment. With written report No. 109-180.
09/15/2005SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/09/2005SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 109-217.
04/06/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/06/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3282-3283)

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 04/06/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 04/06/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 12/13/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 12/14/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 12/15/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs04/06/2005 Referred to
06/09/2005 Hearings by
09/15/2005 Markup by
11/16/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-180
House Veterans' Affairs12/22/2005 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health01/19/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.716. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (12/22/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

Vet Center Enhancement Act of 2005 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to employ up to 50 veterans of Operations Enduring Freedom or Iraqi Freedom to provide outreach to veterans on the availability of readjustment counseling and related mental health services at vet centers operated through the Department of Veterans Affairs.

Revises provisions concerning the provision of bereavement counseling to the family of members of the Armed Forces who die while serving on active military duty to: (1) include the parents of such members within such authority; and (2) allow such counseling to be provided through vet centers.

Authorizes appropriations for FY2006 for the provision of readjustment counseling and related mental health services through vet centers.