Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/11/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 04/11/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 04/11/2005
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/11/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/13/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 04/27/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/27/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/27/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/09/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/09/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/09/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/09/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/09/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/09/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/09/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/09/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 05/09/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/09/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/09/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/09/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 05/09/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/09/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/09/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/12/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/12/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/12/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/12/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/17/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/17/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/25/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/25/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/25/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 05/25/2005
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/25/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/06/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/21/2005
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/15/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/13/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/21/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 10/17/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/20/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/20/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/20/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/20/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/20/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/24/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 10/24/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 10/24/2005
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/26/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/26/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/26/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/26/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 10/26/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 11/01/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/01/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/01/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 11/01/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 11/01/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 11/14/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 12/16/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 12/21/2005
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/29/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/29/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/29/2006
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/27/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/24/2006