Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 06/23/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/23/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/23/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/30/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 07/26/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/08/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/09/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/13/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/13/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/15/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/19/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/19/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/20/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/21/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 10/06/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 10/17/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 10/19/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 12/20/2005