Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 04/13/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 04/13/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/13/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/13/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 04/13/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/21/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/25/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/28/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/11/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/11/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/17/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/13/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/13/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/20/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/28/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/11/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 07/13/2005
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 09/14/2005

Show cosponsors who withdrew