Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/10/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/10/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/18/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/29/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/29/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/19/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/19/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 07/19/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/21/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/28/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/28/2005