Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 04/20/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/27/2005
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/12/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/28/2005