Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 05/10/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/10/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/10/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/10/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/23/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/24/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/27/2005
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/09/2006
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/16/2006
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/28/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/30/2006
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/30/2006
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 04/03/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/06/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/04/2006
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/04/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/04/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/04/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/04/2006
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/04/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/04/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/04/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/04/2006
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/04/2006
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/04/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/04/2006
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/04/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/04/2006
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/04/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/04/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/04/2006
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/04/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/04/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/04/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/04/2006
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/04/2006
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/04/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 05/04/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/04/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/04/2006
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/04/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/05/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/05/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/05/2006
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 05/08/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/08/2006
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 05/19/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/06/2006
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/06/2006
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/06/2006
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/06/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 06/06/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/06/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/06/2006
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/06/2006
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/06/2006
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 06/06/2006
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 06/06/2006
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/06/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/06/2006
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/06/2006
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/06/2006
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 06/06/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/06/2006
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 06/06/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/06/2006
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/06/2006
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/06/2006
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/06/2006
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/06/2006
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/06/2006