Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/17/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/23/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/08/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/14/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/05/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 12/15/2005
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/28/2006
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/13/2006
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/29/2006