Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 04/25/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/28/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/28/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/10/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/16/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 05/16/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/16/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 05/24/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/24/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/08/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/08/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/21/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/21/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/24/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/28/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/12/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/06/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/15/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/24/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 11/07/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/26/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/01/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/08/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/03/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/14/2006
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/27/2006
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/24/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/26/2006
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/01/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/01/2006
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 05/04/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/04/2006
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/04/2006
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/19/2006
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 06/06/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/08/2006
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 06/08/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/13/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/20/2006
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/12/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/25/2006
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 08/03/2006
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 08/03/2006
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 08/03/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 08/03/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 08/03/2006
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 08/03/2006