Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 04/20/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 04/20/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 04/28/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/28/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/12/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/12/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/07/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/08/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/21/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/30/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/30/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/11/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 07/14/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/08/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/25/2005
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 11/15/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/15/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 11/15/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 11/15/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 11/15/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 11/17/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 11/17/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 11/17/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/17/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 11/17/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/17/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 11/17/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 11/17/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 11/17/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 11/17/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 11/17/2005
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 11/17/2005
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/17/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/17/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/17/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 11/17/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/17/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/17/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 11/17/2005
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/17/2005
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 11/17/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/17/2005
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 12/12/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 12/21/2005