Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/07/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/20/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/18/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 12/12/2005
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/10/2006
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/10/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/01/2006
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/01/2006
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/07/2006