Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 04/21/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/16/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/07/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/26/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/17/2006