Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 04/25/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/25/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 04/25/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 04/25/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 04/25/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/25/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/25/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/25/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 04/25/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/25/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/25/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 04/25/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 04/25/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/25/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/25/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 04/25/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/27/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/11/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/16/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/09/2005
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 09/21/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/17/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/16/2006