Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/27/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/27/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/27/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 04/27/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/27/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 04/27/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/27/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/27/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/18/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/14/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 11/02/2005
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/16/2006
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/06/2006
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/25/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/29/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/02/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 08/03/2006