Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/28/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 04/28/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/28/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 04/28/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/28/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 04/28/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/10/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/12/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/08/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 01/30/2006