There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Big Horn Bentonite Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Big Horn Bentonite Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Big Horn Bentonite Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the sale of bentonite in Big Horn County, Wyoming.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9039)
03/14/2005Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 109-37.
01/24/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/02/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2005-10:35amHouseReceived in the House.
07/26/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9039)
03/14/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 52.
03/14/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 109-37.
02/16/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/24/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/24/2005 Referred to
02/16/2005 Markup by
03/14/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-37
House Resources07/27/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources08/02/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.97.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.97. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (07/26/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

Big Horn Bentonite Act - (Sec. 3) Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior (with the consent of the Secretary of the Army) to permit mining and removal of bentonite on certain land previously withdrawn for military purposes in Big Horn County, Wyoming.

Directs the Secretary to enter into a sole-source mining and removal of bentonite contract that provides for payment to the Secretary of $1.00 per ton of bentonite removed from such land.

Sets forth contract terms and conditions.

(Sec. 4) Requires the Secretary, upon notification by the Secretary of the Army that closure of the land is required for purposes of either national emergency, national defense, or national security, to: (1) order the suspension of such authorized mining activity; and (2) close the land until the Secretary of the Army signals that the closure is no longer necessary.

Shields both Secretaries from liability for damages resulting from such closure.