Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/10/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/10/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/10/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/26/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/28/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 10/20/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/09/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/02/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/02/2006
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 05/11/2006