Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 06/14/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/14/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 06/14/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 06/14/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 06/14/2006
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 06/14/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/26/2006
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/11/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/11/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/05/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 11/14/2006