Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 02/08/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/11/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 04/11/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/11/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/11/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/11/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 04/11/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/21/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/21/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/21/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/21/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/21/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/09/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/09/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/19/2005