There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution relating to correcting a clerical error in the enrollment of S. 3693.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/29/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR 7/28/2005 H6227)
07/20/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8091; text as passed Senate: CR S8091; text of measure as introduced: CR S8071)
07/20/2006Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber
07/29/2006-1:50amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/29/2006-1:50amHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR 7/28/2005 H6227)
07/29/2006-1:50amHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H6227)
07/29/2006-1:50amHouseMr. Cannon asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
07/24/2006-3:54pmHouseHeld at the desk.
07/24/2006-2:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/21/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/20/2006SenateSubmitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8091; text as passed Senate: CR S8091; text of measure as introduced: CR S8071)

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (0)

As of 06/26/2019 text has not been received for S.Con.Res.112 - A concurrent resolution relating to correcting a clerical error in the enrollment of S. 3693.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.112. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (07/29/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Directs the Secretary of the Senate to make a correction in the enrollment of S. 3693 (technical corrections to the Violence Against Women and Department of Justice Reauthorization Act of 2005) relating to provisions of the Immigration and Naturalization Act granting waivers of inadmissibility to aliens who are victims of domestic violence.