Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 07/21/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/31/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/31/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/31/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/31/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/31/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/31/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/31/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/31/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 07/31/2006
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 08/01/2006
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 08/01/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 08/01/2006
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 08/02/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/06/2006