There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution supporting "Lights On Afterschool!", a national celebration of after school programs.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/21/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S10005)
09/21/2006Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10005)
09/15/2006Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber
09/25/2006-9:19pmHouseHeld at the desk.
09/25/2006-2:12pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/22/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/21/2006SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S10005)
09/21/2006SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10005)
09/15/2006SenateReferred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9662)
09/15/2006SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S9661-9662)

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 09/15/2006
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/18/2006
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 09/20/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions09/15/2006 Referred to
09/21/2006 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.116. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (09/21/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Supports the goals and ideals of "Lights On Afterschool!," a national celebration of after-school programs.