There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution providing for correction to the enrollment of the bill H.R. 5946.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/09/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 12/8/2006 H9206)
12/07/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11543; text as passed Senate: CR S11543; text of measure as introduced: CR S11506)
12/07/2006Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
12/09/2006-12:51amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/09/2006-12:51amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 12/8/2006 H9206)
12/09/2006-12:48amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. Con. Res. 123.
12/09/2006-12:48amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR 12/8/2006 H9206)
12/09/2006-12:48amHouseMr. Gilchrest moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
12/08/2006-12:43pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/08/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/08/2006-10:18amHouseReceived in the House.
12/07/2006SenateSubmitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11543; text as passed Senate: CR S11543; text of measure as introduced: CR S11506)

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (0)

As of 01/29/2020 text has not been received for S.Con.Res.123 - A concurrent resolution providing for correction to the enrollment of the bill H.R. 5946.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.123. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (12/09/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Directs the Clerk of the House of Representatives to correct the enrollment of H.R. 5946 (Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Reauthorization Act of 2006) by removing a rule of construction concerning the authority of the Department of Commerce and the Federal Communications Commission.