Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/09/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 03/09/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/09/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 03/09/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/09/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/09/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/09/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/09/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/09/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/09/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/09/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/06/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/25/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/07/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/07/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/11/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 12/15/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/16/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/08/2006