Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 07/27/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/29/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/09/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/22/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 09/30/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 11/08/2005