Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 11/08/2005
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/10/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 11/10/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 11/10/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/10/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/10/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/10/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/10/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 11/10/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/10/2005
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 11/10/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 11/10/2005
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 11/10/2005
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 11/10/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 11/10/2005
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 11/10/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/10/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 11/10/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 11/10/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 11/10/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/10/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 11/10/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 11/10/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 11/10/2005
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/10/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 11/10/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 11/10/2005
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 11/10/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 11/10/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 11/10/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/14/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 11/14/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 11/14/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 11/14/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/14/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/14/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 11/14/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/15/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/15/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 11/15/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 11/16/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/16/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 11/16/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 11/16/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 11/16/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/16/2005