Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 11/17/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 11/17/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 11/17/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 11/17/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 11/17/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 11/17/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 11/17/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 11/17/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 11/17/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 11/17/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/12/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 12/15/2005
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/30/2006
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 05/23/2006