Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 02/02/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/14/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/04/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/14/2005