Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/28/2006
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/31/2006
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 04/05/2006
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/27/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/15/2006
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 05/15/2006
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/24/2006
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/16/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/24/2006
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/27/2006
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 08/02/2006
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 09/06/2006
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 09/11/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/25/2006
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 11/13/2006