Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/11/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/20/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/27/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/20/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/20/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/07/2006