Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 05/23/2006
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/07/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/07/2006
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/08/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/08/2006
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/12/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/14/2006
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/15/2006
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/15/2006
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/16/2006
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 06/19/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/26/2006
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/28/2006
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 06/29/2006
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/29/2006
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/29/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/11/2006
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/11/2006
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 07/12/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/12/2006